EP0810427 - An ocular optical system simulation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohnuma, Kazuhiko 5-2-1-206, Todoroki-cho Inage-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Qi, Hua c/o Hoya Corp., 7-5, Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Minato, Atsuo c/o Hoya Corp., 7-5, Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/21] |
Former [1997/49] | 01 /
Ohnuma, Kazuhiko 5-2-1-206, Todoroki-cho Inage-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | ||
02 /
Oi, Hua c/o Hoya Corp., 7-5, Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Minato, Atuso c/o Hoya Corp., 7-5, Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108761.4 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | JP19960138941 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13894196 | JP19960216223 | 16.08.1996 Original published format: JP 21622396 | JP19960301887 | 13.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30188796 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810427 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810427 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/02, A61B3/10, G09B23/28 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
A61B3/0025 (EP,US);
G02C7/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/33] |
Former [1997/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Simulation des optischen Systems des Auges | [2001/49] | English: | An ocular optical system simulation apparatus | [1997/49] | French: | Dispositif pour la simulation du système optique de l'oeil | [1997/49] |
Former [1997/49] | Vorrichtung zur Simulation des optischen Systems des menschlichen Auges | Examination procedure | 01.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.09.2002 | SE | 18.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | SE | 18.12.2002 | |
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 18.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5532770 (SCHNEIDER RICHARD T ET AL) [PX] 1-8 * column 3, line 48 - column 9, line 56; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0663179 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1,9,16 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 22 * * page 5, line 4 - line 16 * * page 7, line 8 - line 22; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9418636 (UNIV ARIZONA) [A] 1 * page 7, line 21 - page 15, line 26; figures 1-10; claim 1 *; | [A]US5293533 (KLYCE STEPHEN D) [A] 1 * column 1, line 38 - line 51 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 52; figures 3,4,9,10; claims 1,8 *; | [A]JPH04371912 ; | [A]JPH06341923 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930520), vol. 017, no. 255, Database accession no. (P - 1539), & JP04371912 A 19921224 (MEIDENSHA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 095, no. 003, & JP06341923 A 19941213 (CANON INC) [A] 16 * abstract * |