EP0812984 - A malfunction determining apparatus of an exhaust gas recirculation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshihara, Masatomo c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ito, Tokiji c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/51] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108799.4 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | JP19960151302 | 12.06.1996 Original published format: JP 15130296 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0812984 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0812984 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812984 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
F02D41/0055 (EP,US);
F02M26/49 (EP,US);
F02M26/57 (EP,US);
F02D41/0077 (EP,US);
F02M26/48 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Detektion einer Fehlfunktion eines Abgasrückführungssystems | [1997/51] | English: | A malfunction determining apparatus of an exhaust gas recirculation system | [1997/51] | French: | Dispositif pour détecter un fonctionnement défectueux d'un système de récirculation de gaz d'échappement | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 26.06.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4208133 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, paragraph L; figure 3 *; | [X]US4723528 (TAMURA IKUO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 56 - line 61; figure 2 *; | [DA]US5113835 (SEKI YASUNARI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0886248 ; | [A]JPH07269392 ; | [A]US5207093 (MAEDA MIE [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4834054 (HASHIMOTO TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5508926 (WADE DAVID R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, & JP08086248 A 19960402 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07269392 A 19951017 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |