EP0816122 - Transfer decorated members and the method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, 1-chome, Taito Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, 1-chome, Taito Taito-ku, Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, 1-chome, Taito Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Misumi, Hiroaki c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd., 5-1, 1-chome, Taito Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Namba, Keijirou c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd., 5-1, 1-chome, Taito Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Yuji c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd., 5-1, 1-chome, Taito Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108801.8 | 02.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960167493 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16749396 | JP19960197559 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19755996 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816122 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816122 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816122 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17, B44C5/04, B29C59/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B44C5/043 (EP);
B44C1/17 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP);
B29C51/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/37] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gegenstände dekoriert unter Verwendung einer Übertragungsfolie und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1998/02] | English: | Transfer decorated members and the method of manufacturing the same | [1998/02] | French: | Objets décorés utilisant une feuille de transfert et procédé pour les fabriquer | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 30.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2289439 (PYRAMID SCREEN PRINT LIMITED) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 14 - page 12, line 1 *; | [XA]WO9416901 (MEKOPRINT A/S) [X] 1-7,11,12 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 10 * [A] 8-13; | [X]EP0625433 (ILCAM SPA) [X] 1,3-6 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 33 *; | [X]WO9221514 (KEY-TECH INC.) [X] 1,7 * page 8, line 1 - page 19, line 23 *; | [XA]US5324378 (R. SIEBER) [X] 1-6 * column 6, line 45 - column 11, line 25 * [A] 7-13; | [A]US5091031 (V. STRAPAZZINI) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 30 * |