EP0810532 - A lossless data compression method and apparatus that also facilitates signal analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/49] | A lossless data compression technique that also facilitates signal analysis | ||
[2001/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin New Jersey 08830 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, New Jersey 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riley, Michael-Joseph 303 Center Street Groveland, MA 01834 / US | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108809.1 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | US19960657855 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: US 657855 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0810532 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0810532 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810532 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/00, H03M7/00, H03M7/48 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
H03M7/48 (EP,US);
H03M7/30 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
|
Former IPC [1997/49] | G06F15/00, H03M7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1999/44] |
Former [1997/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verlustfreies Datenkomprimierungsverfahren und eine Vorrichtung dafür mit zusätzlicher Vereinfachung der Signalanalyse | [2001/32] | English: | A lossless data compression method and apparatus that also facilitates signal analysis | [2001/32] | French: | Méthode et appareil de compression de données sans perte qui facilite aussi l'analyse de signaux | [2001/32] |
Former [1997/49] | Verlustfreies Datenkomprimierungsverfahren mit zusätzlicher Vereinfachung der Signalanalyse | ||
Former [1997/49] | A lossless data compression technique that also facilitates signal analysis | ||
Former [1997/49] | Méthode de compression de données sans perte qui facilite aussi l'analyse de signaux | Examination procedure | 16.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 14.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07202983 ; | [A]JPH01303873 ; | [A]JPS6113831 ; | [A]JPH05303598 ; | [A]US4684923 (KOGA TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1,6,11 * column 6, line 31 - column 10, line 3; figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0313191 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,6,11 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5093831 (SERIZAWA SHOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * column 2, line 47 - line 66; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07202983 A 19950804 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900223), vol. 014, no. 102, Database accession no. (E - 0894), & JP01303873 A 19891207 (CANON INC) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860606), vol. 010, no. 158, Database accession no. (E - 409), & JP61013831 A 19860122 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940222), vol. 018, no. 110, Database accession no. (P - 1698), & JP05303598 A 19931116 (FUJI TEC KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 5,9,10 * abstract * |