EP0833108 - Assembly including a baking oven and a cooking hob [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/05] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roch, Klemens, Dipl-Ing. (FH) J.-B.-Kapfer-Strasse 23 83308 Trostberg / DE | 02 /
Gassner, Christian Stotthamerstrasse 27 83339 Chieming / DE | 03 /
Theine, Markus, Dipl.-Ing. Waginger Strasse 13 83395 Freilassing / DE | 04 /
Neuhauser, Wilhelm Hassmoning 61 83301 Traunreut / DE | 05 /
Plankl, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Hinterwies 2 83301 Traunreut / DE | [1998/14] | Application number, filing date | 97108810.9 | 02.06.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | DE1996139959 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19639959 | [1998/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833108 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833108 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/00 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
F24C15/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1998/51] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung mit einem Backofen und einer Kochmulde | [1998/14] | English: | Assembly including a baking oven and a cooking hob | [1998/14] | French: | Ensemble comprenant un four et une table de cuisson | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 16.07.2003 | [2003/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2256921 (CANNON IND LTD [GB]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2,3; | [E]FR2748796 (MERLONI ELECTROMENAGER [FR]) [E] 1,6,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2947151 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 8,9 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]DE3028262 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [A] 1 * the whole document * |