EP0811905 - Storage control and computer system using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayama, Shinichi 8-11-207, Nishisakawa-1-chome Odawara-shi / JP | 02 /
Yokohata, Shizuo 4-23, Fujimigaoka-2-chome, Ninomiyamachi Naka-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108823.2 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | JP19960163927 | 04.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16392796 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811905 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811905 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F3/0607 (EP,US);
G06F3/0632 (EP,US);
G06F3/0661 (EP,US);
G06F3/0685 (EP,US);
G06F12/0866 (EP,US);
G06F2003/0697 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/34] |
Former [1997/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Speichersteuerung und diese verwendendes Rechnersystem | [1997/50] | English: | Storage control and computer system using the same | [1997/50] | French: | Commande de mémoire et système informatique l'utilisant | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03027725.5 / EP1403757 | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5206939 (YANAI MOSHE [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS63211019 ; | [A]JPH03265945 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890106), vol. 013, no. 001, Database accession no. (P - 808), & JP63211019 A 19880901 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920224), vol. 016, no. 075, Database accession no. (P - 1316), & JP03265945 A 19911127 (NEC CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |