EP0806417 - Novel optically active benzene derivatives, process for producing the same and liquid-crystalline composition containing said derivatives as liquid-crystalline compound and light switching elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama-4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [2000/10] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higashii, Takayuki 4-6 Kamoricho-2-chome Kishiwada-shi / JP | 02 /
Kurimoto, Isao 8-3-203, Senriyamahigashi-4-chome Suita-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Toda, Shoji 9-1-109, Tamagawa-1-chome Takatsuki-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Minai, Masayoshi 1606-5 Harimadacho Moriyama-shi / JP | 05 /
Tani, Takeshi 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 06 /
Kawakami, Chizu 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 07 /
Fujisawa, Koichi 23-7, Namiki-3-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | [1998/05] |
Former [1997/46] | 01 /
Higashii, Takayuki 4-6 Kamoricho-2-chome Kishiwada-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Kurimoto, Isao 11-8-108 Sonehigashinocho-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Toda, Shoji 2-40 Hirata-1-chome Ibaraki-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Minai, Masayoshi 1606-5 Harimadacho Moriyama-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Tani, Takeshi 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | |||
06 /
Kawakami, Chizu 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | |||
07 /
Fujisawa, Koichi 23-7, Namiki-3-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97108841.4 | 22.09.1989 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | JP19880238091 | 22.09.1988 Original published format: JP 23809188 | JP19880238092 | 22.09.1988 Original published format: JP 23809288 | JP19880238094 | 22.09.1988 Original published format: JP 23809488 | JP19880258938 | 13.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25893888 | JP19880263748 | 18.10.1988 Original published format: JP 26374888 | JP19890106659 | 25.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10665989 | JP19890138333 | 30.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13833389 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806417 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806417 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/24, C09K19/34 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07C39/12 (EP,US);
C07C43/2055 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07C45/673 (EP,US);
C07C45/676 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
C07C49/82 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07C65/105 (EP,US);
C07C65/21 (EP,US);
C07C65/24 (EP,US);
C07C65/40 (EP,US);
C07C69/007 (EP,US);
C07C69/017 (EP,US);
C07C69/76 (EP,US);
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C09K19/126 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/673, C07C49/82 (EP,US);
C07C45/676, C07C49/82 (US,EP);
C07C45/71, C07C49/84 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/46] | Title | German: | Optisch aktive Benzol-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und flüssigkristalline Zusammensetzung, welche solche Derivate als flüssigkristalline Verbindung enthält und Licht-Ausschaltelemente | [1997/46] | English: | Novel optically active benzene derivatives, process for producing the same and liquid-crystalline composition containing said derivatives as liquid-crystalline compound and light switching elements | [1997/46] | French: | Dérivés du benzène optiquement actifs, procédé pour les produire et composition de cristaux liquides contenant lesdits dérivés comme composés cristaux liquides et éléments d'interruption de la lumière | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89309700.6 / EP0360622 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6344551 ; | [A]GB2181429 (CANON KK) [A] 1-21* page 15, formula (IV)-(2); claims * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880720), vol. 12, no. 258, Database accession no. (C - 513)<3105>, & JP63044551 A 19880225 (CANON INC.) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | Examination | EP0267758 | EP0270243 |