EP0811673 - Method for removing mercaptans from lng [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc. 4100 Clinton Drive Houston Texas 77020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc. 4100 Clinton Drive Houston, Texas 77020 / US | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states The M.W. Kellogg Company 601 Jefferson Avenue Houston, Texas 77002-7990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandez de la Vega, Felix J. 1602 Big Lake Houston, Texas / US | 02 /
Durr, Charles A. 415 Electra Houston, Texas / US | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Weickmann & Partner, Kopernikusstrasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108900.8 | 03.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | US19960657508 | 04.06.1996 Original published format: US 657508 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0811673 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0811673 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811673 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C10L3/10 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
F25J3/0209 (EP,US);
C10L3/10 (EP,KR,US);
F25J1/0022 (EP,US);
F25J1/0231 (EP,US);
F25J1/0241 (EP,US);
F25J1/025 (EP,US);
F25J3/0233 (EP,US);
F25J3/0238 (EP,US);
F25J3/0242 (EP,US);
F25J3/0247 (EP,US);
F25J2200/02 (EP,US);
F25J2200/74 (EP,US);
F25J2205/30 (EP);
F25J2205/60 (EP,US);
F25J2215/62 (EP,US);
F25J2215/64 (EP,US);
F25J2215/66 (EP,US);
F25J2220/60 (EP,US);
F25J2220/62 (EP,US);
F25J2220/66 (EP,US);
F25J2290/12 (EP,US);
Y10S62/922 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Merkaptanen aus LNG | [1997/50] | English: | Method for removing mercaptans from lng | [1997/50] | French: | Procédé d'élimination de mercaptanes de GNL | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3899312 (KRUIS AUGUST, et al); | [A]EP0129704 (NORTON CO [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4853012 (BATTEUX JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * claims 1,2 * * example 1 *; | [A]EP0612968 (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |