EP0812029 - Plural frequency antenna feed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo California 90245-0956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states HE HOLDINGS, INC. dba HUGHES ELECTRONICS 7200 Hughes Terrace Los Angeles, CA 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boldissar, Frank, Jr. 2836 Pickard Ave Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert Otten & Steil Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108949.5 | 03.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | US19960660314 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: US 660314 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812029 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812029 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q5/00, H01Q13/02, H01P1/213 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
H01Q13/0258 (EP,US);
H01P1/2131 (EP,US);
H01Q5/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/34] |
Former [1997/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antennenspeiseeinrichtung für mehrere Frequenzen | [1997/50] | English: | Plural frequency antenna feed | [1997/50] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation d'antenne pour plusieurs fréquences | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2166298 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, line 75 - line 129 * * page 2, line 16 - line 121; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US3098983 (OLINER ARTHUR A) [Y] 1-17 * column 1, line 39 - line 55 * * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 50; figures 7-10 *; | [A]US3838362 (KURTZ L) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 29; figures 2-6 *; | [A]GB2194859 (CA MINISTER NAT DEFENCE) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 90 - page 6, line 36; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0098192 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 31; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3698001 (KOYAMA MASAKI, et al) [A] 1,9,10,13-15 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 68; figures 6-7B * |