EP0811807 - Movable holding device for a food support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gaggenau Hausgeräte GmbH Eisenwerkstrasse 11 76571 Gaggenau / DE | [1997/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunner, Dieter Kreuzenäckerstrasse 9 76571 Gaggenau / DE | 02 /
Damrath, Joachim, Dr. Hauptstrasse 188b 76571 Gaggenau / DE | 03 /
Kornberger, Martin, Dr. Balzenbergstrasse 92 76530 Baden-Baden / DE | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Schenkel, Klaus, et al BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Schenkel, Klaus BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH, et al Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/50] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, Dr., Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany, Patentanwälte, et al Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108996.6 | 04.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | DE1996122608 | 05.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19622608 | [1997/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0811807 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0811807 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/16 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
F24C15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/47] |
Former [1997/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bewegbare Haltevorrichtung für einen Gargutträger | [1997/50] | English: | Movable holding device for a food support | [1997/50] | French: | Dispositif de suspension mobile pour un support d'alimentation | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/28] | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.10.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2611461 (NEFF WERKE) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4236740 (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2036885 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2139990 (WEISKITTEL ANTON K) [A] 12 * the whole document * |