EP0812867 - Process for lacquering substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schubert, Walter, Dr. Unterdahl 22 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Dücoffre, Volker Karl-Theodor-Strasse 19 42119 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
Tännert, Klaus Nassaustrasse 21 42389 Wuppertal / DE | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109067.5 | 05.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | DE19961023370 | 12.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19623370 | [1997/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812867 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812867 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/78, C09D133/06 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
C08G18/4063 (EP);
C08G18/7893 (EP);
C09D133/066 (EP);
C09D167/00 (EP);
C08L67/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/066, C08L2666/14, C08L2666/28 (EP);
C09D167/00, C08L33/00, C08L2666/28 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/35] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lackierung von Substraten | [1997/51] | English: | Process for lacquering substrates | [1997/51] | French: | Procédé pour le revêtement de substrats | [2003/13] |
Former [1997/51] | Procédé pour revêtir des substrats | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.08.2003 | GB | 20.08.2003 | IT | 20.08.2003 | NL | 20.08.2003 | SE | 20.11.2003 | ES | 01.12.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 20.08.2003 | |
GB | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/46] | GB | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | NL | 20.08.2003 | |
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 20.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9530663 (CYTEC TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 4; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0604922 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [DA] 1 * page 2, line 38 - page 7, line 44; example -; claims 1-5 *; | [DA]US4939213 (JACOBS III WILLIAM [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 33 - column 7, line 33; claims 1-4 * |