EP0814171 - Aluminum alloy casting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | Revocation of patent | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | ||
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fields, James R. 106 Pheasant Run Drive Export, PA 15632 / US | 02 /
Chu, Men Glen R.D. No. 1 Roselyn Drive Export, PA 15632 / US | 03 /
Cisko, Lawrence W. R.D. No. 11, 112 Chris Drive Irwin, PA 15642 / US | 04 /
Drane, Donald L. 203 Hulton Road New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | 05 /
Eckert, George C. 5021 Greensburg Road Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | 06 /
Full, George C. 5021 Greensburg Road Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | 07 /
Hornack, Thomas R. 312 Glenmore Street Lower Burrell, PA 15068 / US | 08 /
Kasun, Thomas J. 124 Nassau Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | 09 /
Klingensmith, Marshall A. 185 White Oak Drive New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | 10 /
Mcmichael, Jerri F. 527 Deborah Jane Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | 11 /
Manzini, Richard A. 112 Edenboro Drive Greensburg, PA 15601 / US | 12 /
Miller, Janel M. 3324 Garvers Ferry Road Lower Burrell, PA 15068 / US | 13 /
Pajerski, Victor A. 1028 Merwin Road Upper Burrell, PA 15068 / US | 14 /
Premkumar, M.K. 3903 Stonecliffe Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 15 /
Robinson, Robert E. 44 Appennine Road Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | 16 /
Rodjom, Thomas J. 4009 Pin Oak Lane Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | 17 /
Scott, Gerald D. 509 Lacebark Court Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 18 /
Truckner, William G. R.D. No. 1, Box 22BC Avonmore, PA 15618 / US | 19 /
Wallace, Robert C. 1100 Forest Avenue New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | 20 /
Zaidi, Mohammad A. 1412 Stonecliffe Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | [1998/14] |
Former [1997/52] | 01 /
Fields, James R. 106 Pheasant Run Drive Export, PA 15632 / US | ||
02 /
Chu, Men Glen R.D. No. 1 Roselyn Drive Export, PA 15632 / US | |||
03 /
Cisko, Lawrence W. R.D. No. 11, 112 Chris Drive Irwin, PA 15642 / US | |||
04 /
Drane, Donald L. 203 Hulton Road New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | |||
05 /
Eckert, George C. 5021 Greensburg Road Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | |||
06 /
Full, George C. 5021 Greensburg Road Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | |||
07 /
Hornack, Thomas R. 312 Glenmore Street Lower Burrell, PA 15068 / US | |||
08 /
Kasun, Thomas J. 124 Nassau Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | |||
09 /
Klingensmith, Marshall A. 185 White Oak Drive New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | |||
10 /
Mcmichael, Jerri F. 527 Deborah Jane Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | |||
11 /
Manzini, Richard A. 112 Edenboro Drive Greensburg, PA 15601 / US | |||
12 /
Miller, Janel M. 3324 Garvers Ferry Road Lower Burrell, PA 15068 / US | |||
13 /
Pajerski, Victor A. 1028 Merwin Road Upper Burrell, PA 15068 / US | |||
14 /
Premkumar, M.K. 3903 Stonecliffe Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | |||
15 /
Robinson, Robert E. 44 Appennine Road Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | |||
16 /
Rodjom, Thomas J. 4009 Pin Oak Lane Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | |||
17 /
Scott, Gerald D. 16 Coventry Drive Massena, NY 13662 / US | |||
18 /
Truckner, William G. R.D. No. 1, Box 22BC Avonmore, PA 15618 / US | |||
19 /
Wallace, Robert C. 1100 Forest Avenue New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | |||
20 /
Zaidi, Mohammad A. 1412 Stonecliffe Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/52] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109128.5 | 06.03.1990 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | US19890320140 | 07.03.1989 Original published format: US 320140 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814171 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814171 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/04, C22B21/06 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
C22C21/04 (EP);
B22D18/00 (KR);
B22D17/14 (EP);
B22D17/2007 (EP);
B22D17/2015 (EP);
B22D17/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/52] | Title | German: | Aluminiumlegierungsgussstück | [1997/52] | English: | Aluminum alloy casting | [1997/52] | French: | Pièce coulée en alliage d'aluminium | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90905277.1 / EP0462218 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Aluminium Rheinfelden GmbH Friedrichstr. 80 D-79618 Rheinfelden / DE Opponent's representative patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag, et al, et al Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Aluminium Rheinfelden GmbH Friedrichstr. 80 D-79618 Rheinfelden / DE Opponent's representative patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag, et al, et al Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | 10.10.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.07.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/41] | Request for further processing for: | 19.07.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2001 | Decision despatched | 31.08.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2002 | CH | 04.12.2002 | LI | 04.12.2002 | NL | 04.12.2002 | SE | 04.03.2003 | [2003/39] |
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5967350 ; | [A]FR918574 (Y.DARDEL); | [A]US3087808 (GOTTSCHALK ROY F); | [A]AT333452B (ELIN UNION AG [AT]); | [A]US4049248 (GJOSTEEN OLE GEORG, et al); | [A]EP0248459 (WIJK GIJSBERT WILLEM MEINDERT); | [A]EP0258567 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A] - METALS HANDBOOK, 9 TH ED, VOL 2, METALS PARK, OHIO, US, ASM, (1979), XP002043676 [A] 1-4 * page 142; table 1 * * page 147; table 4 * * page 164 - page 168 * * page 172 - page 173 * | [A] - METALS HANDBOOK, 9TH ED, VOL 15, METALS PARK, OHIO, US, ASM, (1988), XP002043677 [A] 1 * page 164 - page 165 * | [A] - SOLIDIFICATION PROCESSING 1987, PROC. 3RD INT. CONF., LONDON, GB, INSTITUTE OF METALS, (1988), XP002043678 [A] 1 * Q.T.FANG ET AL "EFFECT OF SOLIDIFICATION CONDITIONS ON HYDROGEN POROSITY FORMATION IN UNIDIRECTIONALLY SOLIDIFIED ALUMINIUM ALLOYS"; page 33 - page 36 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840803), vol. 008, no. 168, Database accession no. (C - 236), & JP59067350 A 19840417 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] * abstract * |