EP0819406 - Computer tomography apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hupke, Rolf, Dr. Gerberstrasse 1 90542 Eckental / DE | [1998/04] | Application number, filing date | 97109328.1 | 09.06.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | DE1996124681 | 20.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19624681 | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819406 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819406 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, G01N23/04, G01N23/207, G01T1/29 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/4085 (EP,US);
A61B6/5205 (EP,US);
G01T1/20182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/40] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Computertomograph | [1998/04] | English: | Computer tomography apparatus | [1998/04] | French: | Appareil de tomographie | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 09.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Request for further processing for: | 02.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0109205 (PICKER INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3 [A] 6; | [A]EP0112475 (TOSHIBA KK [JP])[A] 1-3,6; | [A]CA1245375 (UNIV SHERBROOKE) [A] 1-3,6; | [A]EP0365301 (PICKER INT INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6; | [XA]US5025463 (SAITO YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 [A] 6; | [A]US5164973 (TAKAHASHI TETSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6; | [A]DE4209376 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5; | [A]WO9520910 (ANALOGIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 | Examination | US5291402 |