EP0813183 - Speech reproducing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tadashi, Emori c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109421.4 | 10.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | JP19960147133 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14713396 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0813183 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0813183 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/04, G10L19/14 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
G10L21/04 (EP,US);
G10L19/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/51] | G10L3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1999/40] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sprachwiedergabesystem | [1997/51] | English: | Speech reproducing system | [1997/51] | French: | Système de reproduction de la parole | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0714089 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figure 8 * * page 2, line 46 - line 47 * * page 3, line 41 - line 42 * * page 4, line 13 - line 17 * * page 4, line 33 - line 34 * * page 9, line 33 - line 56 *; | [PX]EP0770987 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 42 - line 46 * * column 4, line 21 - line 29 * * column 12, line 28 - line 36 ** column 17, line 56 - column 18, line 21 * |