EP0818644 - Tooth profile for roller chain sprocket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO. 17-96, Tsurumi 4-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 538 / JP | [1998/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Tadasu 25-28, Ontacho 1-chome Higashimurayama-shi, Tokio / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Konzo 1179-10-210, Hanno Hanno-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Naumann, Ulrich Ullrich & Naumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Naumann, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Ullrich & Naumann, Gaisbergstrasse 3 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109430.5 | 11.06.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | JP19960179292 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17929296 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818644 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818644 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818644 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/30 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
F16H7/06 (EP,US);
F16H55/30 (EP,US);
F16H2055/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/41] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zahnprofil für ein Rollenkettenrad | [1998/03] | English: | Tooth profile for roller chain sprocket | [1998/03] | French: | Profil de dent pour un pignon d'une chaîne à rouleaux | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05231500 ; | [PAL]JPH0942423 ; | [A]EP0463711 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 4-7 *; | [Y]EP0522984 (BG INNOVATION SARL [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 2, lines 44-58 - column 3, lines 23-29; figure 2 *; | [A]US5397278 (SUZUKI TADASU [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 47-51 *; | [E]WO9727411 (CLOYES GEAR & PRODUCTS INC [US]) [E] 1 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 32; figure 6 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931216), vol. 017, no. 690, Database accession no. (M - 1530), & JP05231500 A 19930907 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [PAL] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 097, no. 006, & JP09042423 A 19970214 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) [PAL] 1 * abstract * |