EP0812860 - Processes to produce organo-aluminoxane compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company Fifth and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY Fifth and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palackal, Syriac Joseph 2501 Dorchester Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US | 02 /
Welch, Melvin Bruce 4750 Lewis Dr. Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US | 03 /
Geerts, Rolf Leonard 4610 SE Barlow Dr. Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109481.8 | 11.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | US19960660982 | 12.06.1996 Original published format: US 660982 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812860 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812860 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/602, C08F10/00, C08F4/60 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/16 (KR);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/61912 (EP,US);
C08F4/61925 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/14 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6028 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/61912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [1998/35] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Organo-Aluminoxan-Zusammensetzungen | [1997/51] | English: | Processes to produce organo-aluminoxane compositions | [1997/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation de compositions d'organo-aluminoxane | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0557107 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,9-12 * page 7, line 28 - line 40 * * page 10; example 13 * * page 11; example 15 * * page 6, line 19 - line 25 * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]EP0683179 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1,11,14,15 * * page 5, line 39 - line 49 * * examples 1,2 *; | [X]EP0279586 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,10-12 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 6 * * example 5 *; | [X]EP0285443 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,7,8,10-12 * page 12, line 5 - line 35 * * page 11, line 20 - line 22 *; | [Y]EP0515132 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1,2,7,8,10,11 * page 11, line 4 - line 35 *; | [Y]EP0363029 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1,2,7,8,10,11 * page 14 - page 15 *; | [X]EP0685494 (DANUBIA PETROCHEM POLYMERE [AT]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * example 1 * * claims 1,3 * * page 3, line 33 - line 43 * |