EP0813130 - Numerical control for machine-tool or robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gose, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Romesstrasse 8b 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Rath, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Am Röthelheim 33 91052 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Kaever, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Am alten Bahndammm 3 52072 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Ketteler, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Noppiusstrasse 4 52062 Aachen / DE | 05 /
Weck, Manfred, Professor Weingartenstrasse 16 52074 Aachen / DE | 06 /
Klocke, Fritz, Professor Westernstrasse 16 52134 Herzogenaurach / DE | [1997/51] | Application number, filing date | 97109510.4 | 11.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | DE1996123456 | 12.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19623456 | [1997/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0813130 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0813130 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813130 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4065, G05B19/409 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP);
G05B19/4065 (EP);
G05B2219/33287 (EP);
G05B2219/35364 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/51] | G05B19/4065 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/38] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Numerische Steuerung für Werkzeugmaschinen oder Roboter | [1997/51] | English: | Numerical control for machine-tool or robot | [1997/51] | French: | Commande numérique pour machine-outil ou robot | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.09.2002 | SE | 04.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | SE | 04.12.2002 | |
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 04.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0065576 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP0612992 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5414632 (MOCHIZUKI YASUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |