EP0816691 - Stop valve with pressure limitation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koetter, Wolfgang Hohe Anwande 26 71706 Markgröningen / DE | 02 /
Siegenfuehr, Rolf Böblinger Weg 23 71732 Tamm / DE | [1998/02] | Application number, filing date | 97109617.7 | 13.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996127306 | 06.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19627306 | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816691 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816691 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816691 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/01, F15B20/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
F15B11/028 (EP);
F15B13/015 (EP);
F15B2211/20538 (EP);
F15B2211/30505 (EP);
F15B2211/30525 (EP);
F15B2211/3116 (EP);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/353 (EP);
F15B2211/50581 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/02] | Title | German: | Sperrventil mit Druckbegrenzung | [1998/02] | English: | Stop valve with pressure limitation | [1998/02] | French: | Vanne d'arrêt avec limitation de pression | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3216448 (STACEY HUGH J) [Y] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 28 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2559029 (HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN) [Y] 1,2,6 * page 10, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]DE3305282 (ATLAS COPCO AB [SE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0466582 (KOSMEK KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE3048746 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |