EP0814544 - Semiconductor laser with facet coating and method for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/52] | Improved semiconductor lasers and method for making the same | ||
[2001/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | 22.06.2007 | Change - no opposition filed | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | 22.06.2007 | Change - priority | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Hans Peter Eggstrasse 9 8134 Adliswil / CH | 02 /
Latta, Ernst-Eberhard Pfeifenweid 12 8134 Adliswil / CH | 03 /
Gasser, Marcel Tuschgeweg 83 8041 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Roentgen, Peter Berghaldenstrasse 14 8800 Thalwil / CH | 05 /
Jakubowicz, Abram Loostrasse 23 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Klett, Peter Michael, et al IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Säumerstrasse 4 / Postfach 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Klett, Peter Michael, et al International Business Machines Corporation, Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1999/13] | Heusch, Christian, et al International Business Machines Corporation, Saümerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1997/52] | Barth, Carl Otto, et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 97109746.4 | 16.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | EP19960110150 | 24.06.1996 Original published format: EP 96110150 | [2007/29] |
Former [1997/52] | EP19960110150 | 22.06.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814544 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0814544 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814544 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/02 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H01S5/028 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/52] | H01S3/025 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/38] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser mit Spiegelbeschichtung und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/11] | English: | Semiconductor laser with facet coating and method for making the same | [2001/11] | French: | Lasers à semi-conducteur avec un revêtement des facettes et méthode de fabrication | [2001/11] |
Former [1997/52] | Halbleiterlaser und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1997/52] | Improved semiconductor lasers and method for making the same | ||
Former [1997/52] | Lasers à semi-conducteur et méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 01.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4337443 (UMEDA JUN-ICHI ET AL) [X] 1,2,7-9,11 * column 1, lines 30-40 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 28 * * column 7, line 13 - column 8, line 32 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 3-6,12; | [XY]US3943462 (THOMPSON GEORGE H B) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3-6,12; | [A]EP0349193 (SHARP KK) [A] 1,3,6,11,12 * abstract *; | [DA]US5063173 (GASSER MARCEL ET AL) [DA] 1,10,11 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9710630 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV ;PHILIPS NORDEN AB (SE)) [PX] 1,2,7-9,11 * the whole document * | [XA] - STOLYAROV S N, "INFLUENCE OF INTERFERENCE COATINGS ON THE OPTICAL STRENGTH OF SEMICONDUCTOR LASER MIRRORS", SOVIET JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (198808), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 1021 - 1025, XP000001090 [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/QE1988v018n08ABEH012400 |