EP0816111 - Image processing equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kenny, Gary R., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Smith, Dean Leonard, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Kerr, Roger Stanley, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Lewandowsky, Klaus, et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109766.2 | 16.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | US19960672893 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: US 672893 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816111 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816111 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/377 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B41J2/32 (EP,US);
B41J29/377 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/26] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungseinrichtung | [1998/02] | English: | Image processing equipment | [1998/02] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/13] | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0814269 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5519574 (KODAMA NOBUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 35 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [A]US5211493 (STEPHENSON STANLEY WARD [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]EP0411462 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6418645 ; | [A]JPS63112163 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890509), vol. 013, no. 193, Database accession no. (M - 822), & JP01018645 A 19890123 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880926), vol. 012, no. 356, Database accession no. (M - 745), & JP63112163 A 19880517 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |