EP0816279 - Car jack for manoeuvring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kettler, Paul Erich Am Deutergraben 13A 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing. L.H. Haar & Partner, Patentanwälte, Karlstrasse 23 (Haus Otto) 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110017.7 | 19.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996126119 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19626119 | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816279 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66F5/04 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B66F5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rangierwagenheber | [1998/02] | English: | Car jack for manoeuvring | [1998/02] | French: | Cric de véhicule pour manoeuvrer | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/24] | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.08.1998 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1086290 (A.M.C.) [X] 1,6 * page 2, columns 49-80 *; | [X]WO9213671 (HEIM) [X] 1,2,4,8-10 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 10, line 3 *; | [X]CA943946 (VULCAN EQUIPMENT COMPANY) [X] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2860852 (LEWIS); | [A]GB463693 (LAKE & ELLIOT); | [A]FR1376860 (ACCESS EQUIPMENT); | [A]DE4420473 (KLUMPP) |