EP0809402 - External security module for a television signal decoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. One Technology Parkway South, Box 105600 Atlanta, GA 30348 / US | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gammie, Keith Beverly 51 Hawkridge Avenue Markham, Ontario L3P 1W1 / CA | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1998/05] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1997/48] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97110364.3 | 30.01.1991 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | US19900473442 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: US 473442 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809402 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809402 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | Externes Sicherheitsmodul für einen Fernsehsignal-Decodierer | [1997/48] | English: | External security module for a television signal decoder | [1997/48] | French: | Module externe de sécurité pour un décodeur du signal de télévision | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91904975.9 / EP0466916 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2000 | BE | 10.05.2000 | CH | 10.05.2000 | ES | 10.05.2000 | IT | 10.05.2000 | LI | 10.05.2000 | DK | 10.08.2000 | SE | 10.08.2000 | GR | 11.08.2000 | LU | 30.01.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
GR | 11.08.2000 | ||
LU | 30.01.2001 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
GR | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8607224 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US])[A] 1-4,15-23; | [A]EP0343805 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,8,15-23 | Examination | WO8606240 | US4663664 |