EP0817377 - Increased bandwidth for plants with resonant modes using nonlinear notch filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuller, James W. 20 Jones Street Amston, CT 06231 / US | 02 /
Nett, Carl N. 64 Pine Hill Road Tolland, CT 06084 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110425.2 | 25.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | US19960669729 | 26.06.1996 Original published format: US 669729 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0817377 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0817377 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/04 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G05B5/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/19] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vergrösserte Bandbreite für Einrichtungen mit resonanten Moden unter Verwendung von nichtlinearen Kerbfiltern | [1998/02] | English: | Increased bandwidth for plants with resonant modes using nonlinear notch filters | [1998/02] | French: | Largeur de bande augmentée pour systèmes avec modes résonantes employant filtres à réjection non linéaires | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4195265 (VALI ENN [CA]) [A] 1,12* column 6, line 6 - line 12; figure - *; | [XA]EP0577839 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,8,9,11,12,17,19,20,22 * page 5, column 39 - page 6, column 15; figures 5,6 * [A] 3,14 |