EP0816143 - Device for heating and for cooling a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEBASTO KLIMATECHNIK GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 D-82131 Stockdorf / DE | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheid, Helmut Bahnhofstrasse 4 86920 Denklingen / DE | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Wiese, Gerhard Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Wiese, Gerhard Patentanwalt Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110442.7 | 26.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996125927 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19625927 | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816143 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816143 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816143 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B60H1/00371 (EP);
B60H1/32281 (EP);
B60H2001/00228 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IE [2000/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichting zum Heizen und/oder Kühlen eines Fahrzeuges | [1998/02] | English: | Device for heating and for cooling a vehicle | [1998/02] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage et/ou de réfrigération d'un véhicule | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 22.01.2003 | [2004/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2053370 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [X]DE3834387 (HAPPEL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,12 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 55 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0524656 (EBERSPAECHER J [DE]); | [X]DE4209188 (KULMBACHER KLIMAGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2693685 (VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE [FR]) [A] 4 * figure 2 *; | [PX]DE19536974 (THERMAL WERKE BETEILIGUNGEN GM [DE]) [PX] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 56 * * figures 2,3; claim 14 * |