EP0816557 - Fiber sizing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken 710-0801 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama-ken 710-0801 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Koji c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd., 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 02 /
Moriguchi, Eriko c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd., 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 03 /
Katayama, Tetsuya, c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Nakajo-machi Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata-ken / JP | 04 /
Maruyama, Hitoshi c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd., 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110625.7 | 27.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960171308 | 01.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17130896 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816557 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816557 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/333, D06M15/263 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
D06M15/333 (EP,KR);
D06M15/263 (EP);
D06M7/00 (EP);
D06M2101/08 (EP);
D06M2101/32 (EP);
D06M2101/34 (EP);
D06M2200/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Faserschlichtemittel | [2003/18] | English: | Fiber sizing agent | [1998/02] | French: | Agent d'encollage de fibres | [2003/18] |
Former [1998/02] | Schlichtemittel | ||
Former [1998/02] | Agent d'encollage | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 06.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.08.2003 | [2004/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02216239 ; | [A]EP0450437 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 49 * * examples 1-11; claim - *; | [A]GB880980 (REVERTEX LTD) [A] 1-7,9,10 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 122 *; | [A]US4172930 (KAJITANI KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 52 * * table 1 *; | [A]JPS4112076B | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 41, Database accession no. 90-307932, XP002044127 & JPH02216239 A 19900829 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 68-64459P, XP002044128 & JPS4112076B B1 19660702 (GO-OU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |