EP0817301 - Input coupling adjustment arrangement for radio frequency filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelz Dieter 12 the Gateway South Croydon Victoria 3136 / AU | 02 /
Trembath, Natalie 31 Lee Ann Crescent North Croydon, 3136, Victoria / AU | [1998/03] |
Former [1998/02] | 01 /
Pelz, Dieter 58 Blandford Crescent Bayswater, 3153, Victoria / AU | ||
02 /
Trembath, Natalie 31 Lee Ann Crescent North Croydon, 3136, Victoria / AU | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, Kabelkamp 20 30179 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110682.8 | 01.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | AU1996PO00764 | 01.07.1996 Original published format: AU PO076496 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817301 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817301 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/205, H01P5/04 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
H01P1/2053 (EP);
H01P5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, IT, SE [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Justiervorrichtung für die Kopplungseinstellung von Funkfrequenzfilter | [1998/02] | English: | Input coupling adjustment arrangement for radio frequency filters | [1998/02] | French: | Dispositif d'ajustement de couplage d'entrée de filtres à fréquence radio | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 12.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.09.2002 | DK | 11.12.2002 | SE | 11.12.2002 | [2007/17] |
Former [2003/14] | FI | 11.09.2002 | |
SE | 11.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB849490 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8 * page 2, line 83 - line 99; figure 2 * [Y] 6; | [Y]DE3028925 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0334270 (ALCATEL THOMSON FAISCEAUX [FR]) [A] 1,6* column 3, line 20 - line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4005230 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9602073 (EUROP COMMUNITIES [LU], et al) [A] 1-3,6,8 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 9; figure 2 *; | [X] - K. PICHLER ET AL., "VIERKREIS-UHF-BANDFILTER YH AF 1010", SIEMENS-BAUTEILE-INFORMATIONEN, MÜNCHEN, (196812), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 200 - 201, XP002042875 [X] 1-5,8 * page 200, column R, line 1 - line 45; figure 1 * |