EP0821508 - Cryptographic unit touch point logic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheyenne Property Trust 425 California Street, Suite 1450 San Francisco, CA 94104 / US | [1999/38] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klemba, Keith 3319 Vernon Terrace Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
Merkling, Roger 3143 Stockton Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110865.9 | 01.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | US19960685076 | 23.07.1996 Original published format: US 685076 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0821508 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0821508 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0821508 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L9/32, H04L29/06 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
G06F21/72 (EP,US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2111 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/05] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/03] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verschlüsselungseinheit mit Kontaktpunktlogik | [1998/05] | English: | Cryptographic unit touch point logic | [1998/05] | French: | Organe cryptographique avec logique de point de contact | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5164988 (MATYAS STEPHEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column W *; | [A]US4649510 (SCHMIDT WALTER E [US]) [A] 2-20 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 34 *; | [A]WO9514338 (TELUB TEKNIK AB [SE], et al) [A] 5-20 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 13 *; | [A] - CONNER D, "RECONFIGURABLE LOGIC", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, (19960328), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 53 - 56, 58, 60, 62 - 64, XP000592126 [A] 1-21 * page 53, column L, paragraph 1 - page 54, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 56, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * | [A] - FERREIRA R, "THE PRACTICAL APPLICATION OF STATE OF THE ART SECURITY IN REAL ENVIRONMENTS", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - AUSCRYPT '90, (19900108), pages 334 - 355, XP000145211 [A] 6-20 * page 334, paragraph 1 - page 347, paragraph 1 * | [A] - WOO T Y C ET AL, "AUTHENTICATION FOR DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS", COMPUTER, (19920101), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 39 - 52, XP000287833 [A] 17 * page 44, column L, paragraph L - page 47, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.108052 |