EP0885636 - System for simplifying the production of semi-regular polyhedrons (soccer balls) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ihde, Wolfgang Achterstrasse 12 25355 Bullenkuhlen / DE | [1998/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/52] | Application number, filing date | 97110974.9 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1999/36] |
Former [1998/52] | DE1997120501 | 14.05.1997 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885636 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63B41/08 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
A63B41/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/35] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zur Vereinfachung der Herstellung von halbregulären Polyedern (sog. Europafussball) | [1998/52] | English: | System for simplifying the production of semi-regular polyhedrons (soccer balls) | [1998/52] | French: | Système pour la production simplifiée de polyèdres semi-reguliers (ballons de football) | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 24.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/12] | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2712195 (URBAIN ET AL.) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0383714 (BADIA) [X] 1 * column 5, line 29 - line 31; figure 16 *; | [PX]EP0773045 (UHLSPORT GMBH) [PX] 1,2 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 15; figures 1,8,9 *; | [A]DE8908027U (OBERMANN) [A] 1 * page 4, line 13 - line 21; figure - * |