EP0816490 - Mutant prenyl diphosphate synthase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narita, Keishi 104, 20 Kawauchidaiku-cho, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Chika c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Yoshie c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | 04 /
Ohto, Chikara c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | 05 /
Ohnuma, Shinichi 46-1-102 Kawauchikawamae-cho, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 06 /
Nishino, Tokuzo 2-15-3 Minamiyoshinari, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97111022.6 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960191635 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19163596 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816490 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816490 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816490 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, // C12N15/54 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
C12N9/1085 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (KR);
Y10S435/832 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/06] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mutierte Prenyldiphosphatsynthase | [2004/43] | English: | Mutant prenyl diphosphate synthase | [1998/02] | French: | Prényl diphosphate synthase mutant | [2004/43] |
Former [1998/02] | Mutant Prenyl Diphosphat Synthase | ||
Former [1998/02] | Prényl diphosphate syntase mutant | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.09.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0537553 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP0733709 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-11 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 50 * * figures 2-4 *; | [X] - OHNUMA S.-I. ET AL., "Conversion from farnesyl diphosphate synthase to geranylgeranyl diphodphate synthase by random chemical mutagenesis", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., MD US, (19960426), vol. 271, no. 17, pages 10087 - 10095, XP002059505 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 10088, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 10089, paragraph 3 * * page 10091, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 10093, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 10094, column 1, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.17.10087 | [XP] - OHNUMA S.-I. ET AL., "Conversion of product specificity of archaebacterial geranylgeranyl-diphosphate synthase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., MD US, (199608), vol. 271, no. 31, pages 18831 - 18837, XP002059506 [XP] 1 * abstract * * page 18836, column 2 * * figures 5,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.31.18831 | [A] - MARRERO P.F. ET AL., "EFFECTS OF SITE-DIRECTED MUTAGENESIS OF THE HIGHLY CONSERVED ASPARTATE RESIDUES IN DOMAIN II OF FARNESYL DIPHOSPHATE SYNTHASE ACTIVITY", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19921025), vol. 267, no. 30, pages 21873 - 21878, XP002031066 [A] 1-10 |