EP0817239 - Ion trapping mass spectrometry apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baba, Takashi Fuji-Kopo 305, 2-19-14 Motojuku Higashi-Matsuyama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Waki, Izumi 3-23-5-104, Mihara Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97111068.9 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960172023 | 02.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17202396 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817239 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817239 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
H01J49/4225 (EP);
H01J49/423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ionenspeicherungsvorrichtung für Massenspektrometrie | [2003/18] | English: | Ion trapping mass spectrometry apparatus | [1998/02] | French: | Dispositif de stockage d'ions à des fins de spectrométrie de masse | [1998/02] |
Former [1998/02] | Ionenspeicherungsvorrichtung zur Massenspektrometrie | Examination procedure | 30.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 08.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXA]US5576540 (JOLLIFFE CHARLES L) [PX] 1,2,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 30 * * column 6, line 22 - line 53 * * column 8, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 10, line 23 - line 51 * * column 10, line 65 - line 68 * [A] 9; | [DPA]EP0736894 (HITACHI LTD) [DPA] 1,8,9 * abstract *; | [DA]US5420425 (BIER MARK E ET AL) [DA] 1,8 * column 10, line 40 - line 63; figures 2A-2C *; | [DA]EP0262928 (FINNIGAN CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0409362 (FINNIGAN CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0113207 (FINNIGAN CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DPA]WO9702591 (HITACHI LTD ;BABA TAKASHI (JP); WAKI IZUMI (JP)) [DPA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US2939952 (W. PAUL ET AL.) [DA] 1 * figures 2-5; claim 8 *; | [DA] - WAKI I ET AL, "OBSERVATION OF ORDERED STRUCTURES OF LASER-COOLED IONS IN A QUADRUPOLE STORAGE RING", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, vol. 68, no. 13, pages 2007 - 2010, XP000274504 [DA] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.68.2007 | [DA] - D. A. CHURCH, "Strorage-Ring ion Trap derived from the linear quadrupole radio frequency mass filter.", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS., NEW YORK US, (196907), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 3127 - 3134, XP002042989 [DA] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1658153 |