EP0819581 - Air bag for a vehicle occupant restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | Opposition rejected | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | [1998/33] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Jürgen Bürglesrain 7/1 73557 Mutlangen / DE | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97111297.4 | 04.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | DE19962012502U | 18.07.1996 Original published format: DE 29612502 U | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819581 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819581 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
B60R21/239 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/40] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gassack für ein Fahrzeuginsassen-Rückhaltesystem | [1998/04] | English: | Air bag for a vehicle occupant restraint system | [1998/04] | French: | Sac gonflable pour un système de retenue d'un occupant de véhicule | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.2001
ADMISSIBLE Autoliv Development AB Vallentinsvägen 22 S-447 83 Vargarda / SE Opponent's representative Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.2001
ADMISSIBLE Autoliv Development AB Vallentinsvägen 22 S-447 83 Vargarda / SE Opponent's representative Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | 28.01.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.06.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.10.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.11.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0423981 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 18 - line 23; figure 7; claims 1,5,7 *; | [A]EP0495410 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract ** column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 7; figure 7 *; | [X]DE4306615 (AIGNER JOACHIM DIPL ING [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - line 68; figures 3-5,7 * |