EP0820045 - Ionization type smoke detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sievert, Uwe Pastorsbusch 23 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | [1998/04] | Application number, filing date | 97111780.9 | 10.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | DE1996129079 | 18.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19629079 | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0820045 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0820045 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/11, G08B17/113 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
G08B17/113 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/04] | G08B17/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Isonisationsrauchmelder | [1998/04] | English: | Ionization type smoke detector | [1998/04] | French: | Détecteur de fumée à ionisation | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/20] | 20.12.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]DE4402518 (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX) [YD] 1,5 * column 3, line 3 - line 24; figure 2 * * claim 13 * [A] 2; | [Y]DE2048817 (EATON YALE & TOWNE) [Y] 1,5 * page 8, line 6 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2386873 (ANVAR) [A] 1 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US3978397 (BURRY PETER EDWIN ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 37 - line 59; figure 1 * |