EP0819838 - Multifuel combustion engine and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahler, Willi Stegstrasse 4 CH-8912 Obfelden / CH | [1998/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/48] |
Former [1998/04] | Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254 6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 97111916.9 | 14.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | CH19960001796 | 18.07.1996 Original published format: CH 179696 | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819838 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819838 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819838 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02B19/14 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
F02B19/08 (EP);
F02B23/04 (EP);
F02B2201/02 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/30] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrstoffverbrennungsmotor und Verwendung desselben | [1998/04] | English: | Multifuel combustion engine and its use | [1998/04] | French: | Moteur à combustion polycarburant et son application | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB560734 (MIRRLEES BICKERTON & DAY LTD, et al) [X] 1,10 * page 1, line 10 - line 18 * * page 1, line 42 - line 45 * * page 1, line 50 - line 54 * * page 2, line 13 - line 25 * * page 2, line 53 - line 65 * * page 4, line 59 - line 69 * * page 4, line 102 - line 114 * * page 5, line 19 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB294704 (HARRY RALPH RICARDO) [X] 1 * page 3, line 125 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 14 - line 18 * * page 4, line 36 - line 42 * * page 4, line 48 - line 54; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO8801683 (ELSBETT L [DE], et al) [A] 9 * page 5, paragraph 5 * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, line 6 - line 10 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * figures 2,5 *; | [DA]GB2016594 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 5 - line 6 * * page 1, line 35 - line 47 * * page 1, line 76 - line 88; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CH197393 (BUECHI ALFRED [CH]) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 30 - line 44 * * page 2, column R, line 12 - line 16 * * page 2, column L, line 26 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]GB123398 (CROSSLEY KENNETH IRWIN, et al) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 5, line 2; figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO8402378 (MAHLER WILLY) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 6; figure 4 *; | [A]DE837486 (RICARDO & CO ENGINEERS) [A] 2 * figure 2 * | by applicant | DE2913763 | GB2016594 |