EP0891953 - Glass plate with water-repellent film and method for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | ||
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akamatsu, Yoshinori c/o Central Glass Company Ltd., 1510, Oguchi-cho Matsusaka-shi, Mie 515 / JP | 02 /
Yuasa, Akira c/o Central Glass Company Ltd., 1510, Oguchi-cho Matsusaka-shi, Mie 515 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Hideki c/o Central Glass Company Ltd., 1510, Oguchi-cho Matsusaka-shi, Mie 515 / JP | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Finsterwald, Martin, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Finsterwald, Martin, Dr., et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112061.3 | 15.07.1997 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891953 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891953 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/30, C03C17/42, C08J7/04 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
C03C17/42 (EP,US);
C03C2217/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/39] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Glasscheibe mit wasserabweisender Beschichtung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1999/03] | English: | Glass plate with water-repellent film and method for producing same | [1999/03] | French: | Plaque en verre avec un film hydrophobe et procédé de fabrication | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.01.2006 | IT | 11.01.2006 | DE | 12.04.2006 | GB | 15.07.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/07] | IT | 11.01.2006 | |
DE | 12.04.2006 | ||
GB | 15.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | DE | 12.04.2006 | |
GB | 15.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | DE | 12.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0545201 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,7,8,11,21,23 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]JPS5939714 ; | [D]JPH0225990B ; | [DA]JPH06184527 ; | [A]EP0535691 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, column 21 * * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5415927 (HIRAYAMA NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 12 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0624404 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 19 - page 35, line 58 * * page 40, line 50 - page 41, line 1 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0513690 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * example -; claim - *; | [D]JPH04342443 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [DA]JPS60219234 ; | [A]EP0658525 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * example -; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840613), vol. 008, no. 126, Database accession no. (C - 228), & JP59039714 A 19840305 (MATSUMOTO SEIYAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 1,2,5,7,8,11,21,23 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941011), vol. 018, no. 533, Database accession no. (C - 1259), & JP06184527 A 19940705 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [DA] 1-23 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860404), vol. 010, no. 085, Database accession no. (C - 336), & JP60219234 A 19851101 (TORAY KK) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - HAYASHI Y. ET AL, "Mechanical Durability of Water-Repellent Film on Glass", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INTERNATIONAL EDITION., TOKYO JP, (1994), vol. 102, no. 2, pages 208 - 211, XP002050946 [DA] 1-23 * the whole document * |