EP0819924 - Apparatus and method for measuring characteristics of optical pulses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332 / JP | ||
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332 / JP | ||
For all designated states Yamamoto, Yoshihisa 8 Ryan Court Stanford California 94305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Machida, Susumu 4-39, Midori-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180 / JP | 02 /
Jiang, Shudong, Room 201, Park Hills Musashino 4-35, Hachiman-cho 1-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Yoshihisa 8 Ryan Court Stanford, California 94305 / US | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Fiener, Josef Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112135.5 | 16.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | JP19960185235 | 16.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18523596 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819924 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819924 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01J11/00, G04F13/02 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
G04F13/026 (EP,US);
G01J11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/42] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren für die Messung von Charakteristiken von optischen Pulsen | [1998/04] | English: | Apparatus and method for measuring characteristics of optical pulses | [1998/04] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la mesure des caractéristiques d'impulsions optiques | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4792230 (NAGANUMA KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 13, line 34 - line 48; figure 3 *; | [Y]JPS63208729 ; | [A]US4480192 (ALBRECHT GEORG F [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 31 - line 48; figure 1 * | [XY] - OKSANEN J A I ET AL, "A FEMTOSECOND AUTOCORRELATOR WITH INTERNAL CALIBRATION", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (19930901), vol. 64, no. 9, page 2706/2707, XP000395659 [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1143863 | [Y] - KYOO NAM CHOI, "CORRELATION METHOD FOR FEMTOSECOND OPTICAL PULSES", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19930801), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 850 - 853, XP000384622 [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/4/8/009 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881227), vol. 012, no. 499, Database accession no. (P - 807), & JP63208729 A 19880830 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * |