EP0886147 - Device for obtaining a current-proportional magnetic induction at the position of a magnetic field sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landis+Gyr AG Feldstrasse 1 6301 Zug / CH | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Landis + Gyr AG Feldstrasse 1 6301 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Siemens Metering AG Feldstrasse 1 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Electrowatt Technology Innovation AG 6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petr, Jan Stolzengrabenstrasse 33 6317 Oberwil / CH | 02 /
Janssen, Peter Eustrasse 3 6313 Menzingen / CH | [2008/02] |
Former [1998/52] | 01 /
Petr, Jan Stolzengrabenstrasse 33 6317 Oberwil / CH | ||
02 /
Janssen, Peter Luegetenstrasse 19 6313 Menzingen / CH | Representative(s) | Lagler, Louis Rentsch & Partner AG ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Lagler, Louis Rentsch & Partner Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2003/05] | OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2002/13] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112160.3 | 16.07.1997 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | CH19970001182 | 21.05.1997 Original published format: CH 118297 | [1998/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886147 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886147 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/20, G01R33/02 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G01R15/207 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/52] | G01R15/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1999/35] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 23.06.1999 | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Erzielung einer zu einem elektrischen Strom proportionalen magnetischen Induktion am Ort eines Magnetfeldsensors | [1998/52] | English: | Device for obtaining a current-proportional magnetic induction at the position of a magnetic field sensor | [1998/52] | French: | Appareil pour obtenir une inductance magnétique proportionelle à un courant à l'emplacement d'un capteur de champ magnétique | [2008/15] |
Former [1998/52] | Appareil pour obtenir une inductance magnétique proportionelle à un courant à l'amplacement d'un capteur de champ magnétique | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 17.12.2008 | [2010/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4742296 (PETR JAN ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 50 - line 64 * * figures 1,12-14 *; | [A]JPH08241821 ; | [A]JPH0815330 ; | [A]CH659138 (LANDIS & GYR AG) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 36 - line 45 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0618451 (DEUTSCHE ZAEHLER GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 097, no. 001, & JP08241821 A 19960917 (OSAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, & JP08015330 A 19960119 (TOKIN CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |