EP0822159 - Belt Hoist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELEPHANT CHAIN BLOCK COMPANY LIMITED 180, 2-chome, Iwamuro Osaka-Sayama-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states ELEPHANT CHAIN BLOCK COMPANY LIMITED 180, 2-chome, Iwamuro Osaka-Sayama-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Hidenori, Elephant Chain Block Co., Ltd. 180, Iwamuro 2-chome Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Fujikawa, Masaru, Elephant Chain Block Co., Ltd. 180, Iwamuro 2-chome Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Saai, Koji, Elephant Chain Block Co., Ltd. 180, Iwamuro 2-chome Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP | [2001/37] |
Former [1998/06] | 01 /
Fujiwara, Hidenori, Elephant Chain Block Co., Ltd. 180, Iwamuro 2-chome Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Fujiwara, Masaru, Elephant Chain Block Co., Ltd. 180, Iwamuro 2-chome Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Saai, Koji, Elephant Chain Block Co., Ltd. 180, Iwamuro 2-chome Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Schwabe, Hans-Georg Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Schwabe, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112176.9 | 16.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | JP19960202497 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20249796 | JP19960202498 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20249896 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822159 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822159 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66D3/24, B66D3/26, B66D3/22 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
B66D3/02 (EP,US);
B66D3/20 (KR);
B66D3/22 (EP,US);
B66D3/24 (EP,US);
B66D3/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/42] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung mit bandförmigem Tragmittel | [1998/06] | English: | Belt Hoist | [1998/06] | French: | Dispositif de levage à sangle | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 05.08.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 27.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.09.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0082046 (APP LEVAGE ET CONST [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [Y]GB1106253 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1074836 (HUGO GUNGENBERG) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2350295 (NOIROT YVES [FR]) [A] 5 * page 4, lines 26-31 *; | [A]DE2365374 (STAHL R FA); | [A]US3005622 (GEORGES GARNIER) |