EP0833449 - Power output stage for switching an inductive load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states Harris Semiconductor GmbH Richard-Reitzner-Allee 4 85540 Haar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Harris Semiconductor GmbH Richard-Reitzner-Allee 4 85540 Haar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göser, Gerhard 10, Rue de Coudercy 31170 Tournefeuille / DE | 02 /
Elliot, Mark Am Gutshof 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
Preslar, Donald 130 Manners Rd. Ringoes, NJ / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/33] |
Former [2004/04] | Epping, Hermann, Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/28] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/14] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112181.9 | 16.07.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | DE1996140433 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19640433 | [1998/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833449 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/082 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
H03K17/0822 (EP,KR,US);
H03K17/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/51] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leistungsendstufe zum Schalten induktiver Verbraucher | [1998/14] | English: | Power output stage for switching an inductive load | [1998/14] | French: | Etage de sortie de puissance pour la mise en circuit d'une charge inductive | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS57118439 ; | [A]EP0493185 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH07106862 ; | [A]US5111353 (KOTOWSKI JEFFREY P [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4428675 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 6 *; | [A]DE2811149 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821028), vol. 006, no. 215, Database accession no. (E - 138), & JP57118439 A 19820723 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * figure . * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, & JP07106862 A 19950421 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |