EP0821024 - Heterogeneous ion exchange membrane and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terada, Ichiro, Asahi Glass Com., Ltd. Chio kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Higuchi, Yoshiaki, Asahi Glass Com., Ltd. Chio kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Miyake, Haruhisa, Asahi Glass Com., Ltd. Chio kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Umemura, Kazuo, Asahi Glass Com., Ltd. Chio kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112654.5 | 23.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | JP19960194196 | 24.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19419696 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0821024 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0821024 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0821024 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/22 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
C08J5/2275 (EP,US);
C08J2323/06 (EP,US);
C08J2423/16 (EP,US);
C08J2425/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/05] | Title | German: | Heterogene Ionenaustauschmembran und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/05] | English: | Heterogeneous ion exchange membrane and process for its production | [1998/05] | French: | Membrane d'échange d'ions hétérogène et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 27.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.2002 | BE | 12.06.2002 | FI | 12.06.2002 | GR | 12.06.2002 | NL | 12.06.2002 | IE | 23.07.2002 | LU | 23.07.2002 | DK | 12.09.2002 | SE | 12.09.2002 | PT | 16.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | MC | 01.02.2003 | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
FI | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
IE | 23.07.2002 | ||
LU | 23.07.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
IE | 23.07.2002 | ||
LU | 23.07.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
IE | 23.07.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
IE | 23.07.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
IE | 23.07.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
IE | 23.07.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 12.06.2002 | |
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 12.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3627703 (KOJIMA KATSUYOSHI, et al) [DA] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]US3758643 (FISCHER W) [A] 1-5* column W *; | [DA]US4167551 (TAMURA NORIYOSHI, et al) [DA] 1-10 * column W *; | [DA]WO9406850 (IONPURE TECHN CORP [US]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * |