EP0822348 - Snaphook [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABA Hörtnagl KG Werkzeuge - Vorrichtungen Knappenweg 6 6166 Fulpmes / AT | [1998/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörtnagl, Johann Medraz 63a 6166 Fulpmes / AT | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Hefel, Herbert Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Hefel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 97112663.6 | 24.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | AT19960001388 | 02.08.1996 Original published format: AT 138896 | [1998/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822348 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822348 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16B45/02 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
F16B45/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/42] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Karabinerhaken | [1998/06] | English: | Snaphook | [1998/06] | French: | Mousqueton | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 04.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1625874 (SIMOND CLAUDIUS); | [A]DE3827334 (DEWITZ ALVRECHT VON [DE]); | [XA]EP0569059 (STUBAI WERKZEUGIND [AT]); | [A]EP0696687 (SIMOND LUDGER SA [FR]) |