EP0825032 - Method for coating plastic articles, and articles obtained using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [1999/27] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states BASF Coatings Aktiengesellschaft Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states BASF Lacke und Farben AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enthoven, Nicolaas Leonardus Maria, Dr. Rembrandtstraat 42 4003 KW Tiel / NL | 02 /
Sander, Petrus Wilhelmus Rond de watertoren 73 4201 ZP Gorinchem / NL | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | Hüsener, Susanne, Dr. BASF Lacke + Farben AG, Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation, Postfach 61 23 48136 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112717.0 | 24.07.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | DE1996132961 | 16.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19632961 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825032 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
B41M7/02 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J2433/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/45] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Kunststoffteilen sowie die so erhältlichen Kunststoffteile | [1998/09] | English: | Method for coating plastic articles, and articles obtained using the same | [1998/09] | French: | Méthode de revêtement d'articles en plastique et articles ainsi obtenus | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9509876 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE], et al) [YD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3225875 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0560508 (ZENECA RESINS BV [NL]) [A] 1-8 * examples 1,4 * * the whole document *; | [AP]EP0732344 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [AP] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0117350 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5268417 (FILGES ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |