EP0823502 - Method for embroidering with a machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Madeira Asia Pte. Ltd. 3 Maritime Square 11-01 Singapur 099 254 / SG | [1998/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pang Kim Kwang, Ricky Blk. 51 Sims Drive No. 15-136 Singapur 380 051 / SG | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Prietsch, Reiner Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Prietsch, Reiner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Schäufeleinstrasse 7 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112738.6 | 24.07.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | DE1996132092 | 08.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19632092 | [1998/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0823502 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0823502 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823502 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D05C17/00, D06Q1/00, D06B15/06 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
D04C1/04 (EP,US);
D05C17/00 (EP,US);
D06Q1/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT [1999/01] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Maschinenstickverfahren | [1998/07] | English: | Method for embroidering with a machine | [1998/07] | French: | Procédé de broderie à la machine | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 23.10.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, FI, IE, LI, LU, MC, SE | 07.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.11.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05195411 ; | [Y]JPS5567099 ; | [A]US1835866 (HAROLD JOSEPH F X) [A] * page 1, lines 40-45 *; | [A]US2782485 (SCHWERZLER CHARLES F); | [Y]US3315329 (YOSHIHIDE YOSHIOKA) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, lines 10-17 - lines 38-54 * * column 2, lines 30-48 * * column 3, lines 1-25 *; | [A]WO9015895 (GARZONE RAYMOND G JR [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 20 - line 29 *; | [DA]DE4343230 (MEI CHUAN EMBROIDERY ENTERPRIS [TW]) [DA] 1; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931124), vol. 017, no. 632, Database accession no. (C - 1132), & JP05195411 A 19930803 (GOODA ENBU KK) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 27, Database accession no. 80-47132C, XP002057048 & JPS5567099 A 19800520 (MASHITA TAIYO KK) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * |