EP0894463 - Insulated jug and lid therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILKE, Siegfried Neptunstrasse 6 D-7550 Rastatt 17 / DE | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Milke, Karin Riedlerstrasse 30 80339 München / DE | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Hassler, Werner Postfach 17 04 58467 Lüdenscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Hassler, Werner, Dr. Postfach 17 04 58467 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113070.3 | 30.07.1997 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894463 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47J41/00 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
A47G19/12 (EP);
A47J41/0016 (EP);
A47J41/0077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/41] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Isolierkanne und Deckel | [1999/05] | English: | Insulated jug and lid therefor | [1999/05] | French: | Pot à isolation thermique et couvercle | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/32] | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.10.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.10.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE9212614U (STIERLEN-MAQUET AG) [DA] 1,8 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]FR1474334 (HARTOLIT GMBH) [A] 1,10 * page 2, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [A]GB112031 (A. SHARPLES) [A] 1-5,8 * page 1, line 4 - line 15; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE4141849 (STIERLEN-MAQUET AG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2355610 (R. BUSSE) [A] 2 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE1255528 (PORZELLANFABRIK WEIDEN GEBR. BAUSCHER) [A] 6 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0209042 (ROTPUNKT DR. ANSO ZIMMERMANN) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [A]GB751407 (LANDERS, FRARY & CLARK CORP) [A] 9 * page 1, line 61 - line 94; figure 2 * |