EP0822325 - Device to control the air admission section of air intake conduits of combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höfner, Dirk Grasselweg 14 91809 Wellheim / DE | 02 /
Ottowitz, Alfred Welschstrasse 16 85084 Reichertshofen / DE | [1998/06] | Application number, filing date | 97113192.5 | 31.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | DE1996131346 | 02.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19631346 | [1998/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822325 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822325 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/02 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
F02B27/0284 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/05] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Steuern der Ansaugquerschnitte von Verbrennungsluft-Einlassleitungen von Brennkraftmaschinen | [1998/06] | English: | Device to control the air admission section of air intake conduits of combustion engines | [1998/06] | French: | Dispositif de commande de la section d'aspiration de conduits d'admission d'air de moteurs à combustion | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/20] | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3936263 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, line 3 - line 8 * * column 1, line 35 - line 47 * * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, line 30 - line 63; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE4018612 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * column 2, line 36 - line 38 * * column 2, line 48 - line 62 * * column 3, line 4 - line 6 * * column 3, line 18 - line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0551209 (RICARDO CONSULTING ENG [GB]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * column 6, line 14 - line 41 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 38; figures 6-8 *; | [A]DE3446377 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,9 * page 13, line 1 - line 6 * * page 17, line 32 - page 18, line 8 * * page 18, paragraph 4 - page 19, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph 1; figures 2,10-12 *; | [A]DE3603418 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column 3, line 36 - line 60; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0636774 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 49 * * column 3, line 4 - line 15; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPS61255213 ; | [A]DE4313465 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 22 - line 32; figure 3 *; | [DA]EP0645530 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, line 37 - line 47 * * column 5, line 13 - line 20 *; | [A]US5105784 (DAVIS RICHARD S [US], et al) [A] 8 * column 2, line 59 - line 64 * * column 3, line 43 - line 59 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870408), vol. 11, no. 111, Database accession no. (M - 578), & JP61255213 A 19861112 (TOYOTA) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0645530 |