EP0823494 - Lactobionamide containing corrosion inhibitors or corrosion preventing compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Deutschland GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | [1998/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerling, Klaus, Dr. Bruchweg 4 29308 Winsen/Aller / DE | 02 /
Rau, Helge Reichweinstrasse 19 31303 Burgdorf / DE | 03 /
Wendler, Kornelia Gutsstrasse 7 31319 Sehnde / DE | 04 /
Uhlig, Karlheinz Waldesheimer Weg 66 47802 Krefeld / DE | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Dieter Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113202.2 | 31.07.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | DE1996131959 | 08.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19631959 | [1998/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823494 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823494 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/14 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
C10M133/16 (EP,US);
C23F11/145 (EP,US);
C10M2201/02 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/12 (EP,US);
C10M2215/122 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10N2040/20 (EP,US);
C10N2040/22 (EP,US);
C10N2050/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/43] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lactobionsäureamide enthaltende Korrosionschutzmittel und Korrosions-Inhibitoren | [1998/07] | English: | Lactobionamide containing corrosion inhibitors or corrosion preventing compositions | [1998/07] | French: | Compositions inhibiteurs ou protectrices de la corrosion contenant des amides d'acide lactobionique | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 22.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.12.1999 | GB | 29.12.1999 | IT | 29.12.1999 | NL | 29.12.1999 | AT | 31.07.2000 | BE | 31.07.2000 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 29.12.1999 | |
GB | 29.12.1999 | ||
NL | 29.12.1999 | ||
AT | 31.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 29.12.1999 | |
NL | 29.12.1999 | ||
FR | 26.05.2000 | ||
AT | 31.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/14] | GB | 29.12.1999 | |
FR | 26.05.2000 | ||
AT | 31.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 29.12.1999 | |
FR | 26.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 29.12.1999 | |
FR | 26.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2752334 (HENRY WALTON); | [X]EP0541467 (STEPAN EUROPE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 10, line 11 *; | [X]EP0550278 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 7, lines 10-11; claims 1,3,11 *; | [A]EP0550106 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0569869 (SOLVAY DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [A]US5401839 (AU VAN [US], et al); | [X]EP0688781 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * example 7 *; | [PA]EP0726335 (SOLVAY DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [PA] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [PX]EP0748813 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [PX] 1,2 * example 7 * |