EP0821879 - Method and apparatus for extracting a dairy product from whey, in particular ricotta [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sassu, Antonio Via Pertini, 1 07013 Mores (Sassari) / IT | [1998/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/26] |
Former [1999/04] | Luppi, Luigi Luppi & Crugnola S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41100 Modena / IT | ||
Former [1998/06] | Luppi, Luigi Luppi & Crugnola Studio Associato Via Virgilio 56/F 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 97113304.6 | 01.08.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | IT1996CA00015 | 01.08.1996 Original published format: IT CA960015 | [1998/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0821879 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/00, A01J25/08 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
A01J25/115 (EP);
A01J25/008 (EP);
A01J25/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL [1998/42] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 23.07.1998 | RO | 23.07.1998 | SI | 23.07.1998 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Gewinnung eines Molkereiprodukt von Molke, insbesondere Ricotta | [1998/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for extracting a dairy product from whey, in particular ricotta | [1998/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour extraire un produit laitier de lactosérum, en particulier Ricotta | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 06.08.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, FI, GB, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/32] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2003 | Decision despatched | 25.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.10.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.10.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9204825 (SKOVHAUGE ERIK [DK]) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9220217 (SCHWARTE WERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0636311 (EGIDIO GALBANI S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |