EP0809351 - Differential amplifier circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Katsuji c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113589.2 | 08.12.1993 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | JP19920351747 | 08.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35174792 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0809351 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0809351 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
H03F1/3211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | Differenzverstärkerschaltung | [1997/48] | English: | Differential amplifier circuit | [1997/48] | French: | Circuit amplificateur différentiel | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 05.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/11] | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93119773.5 / EP0601560 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2061046 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] * page 1, line 42 - page 3, line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3027071 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]US4460872 (MATTISSON SVEN [SE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - line 65; figure 4 *; | [A]GB2195211 (PLESSEY CO PLC) [A] 1 * page 1, line 87 - line 130; figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0312016 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 7 - line 35; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0352009 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4 * page 4, line 1 - line 46; figure 2 *; | [AP]US5214329 (FURINO JR JAMES P [US]) [AP] 1-3 * column 3, line 10 - line 50; figure 2 *; | [Y] - HIROSHI TANIMOTO ET AL, "REALIZATION OF A 1-V ACTIVE FILTER USING A LINEARIZATION TECHNIQUE EMPLOYING PLURALITY OF EMITTER-COUPLED PAIRS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (19910701), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 937 - 944, XP000237035 [Y] 1,4 * page 938, paragraphs A-D - page 939 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.92013 | [Y] - DE VEIRMAN G A ET AL, "DESIGN OF A BIPOLAR 10-MHZ PROGRAMMABLE CONTINUOUS-TIME 0.05 EQUIRIPPLE LINEAR PHASE FILTER", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (19920301), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 324 - 331, XP000295882 [Y] 4 * page 326; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.121554 | [A] - KOYAMA, M. ET AL, "A 10.7 MHz continuous-time bandpass filter bipolar IC", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1989 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK USA, (1989), pages 25.2.1 - 25.2.4, XP002050487 [A] 1,4 * page 25.2.1 - page 25.2.3; figure 4 * |