EP0831561 - Assembling of electrical connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | ||
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heimüller, Hans-Jost Schafgarten 9 67373 Dudenhofen / DE | 02 /
Sträb, Martin Bannzeile 16 86911 Diessen / DE | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 97113605.6 | 06.08.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | DE1996138499 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19638499 | [1998/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0831561 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0831561 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
H01R13/62927 (EP,US);
H01R13/4361 (EP,US);
H01R13/62911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/15] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckverbinderkupplung | [1998/13] | English: | Assembling of electrical connectors | [1998/13] | French: | Assemblage de connecteurs électriques | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19602435 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [E] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [E]DE19624646 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [E] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]DE3645179 (AMP) [AD] 1,4,8,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]DE3730020 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19604862 (CINCH CONNECTEURS SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |