EP0826873 - Device for distributing fuel for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2002 | Examination report or reply | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stehr, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Helgoländer Strasse 3 38518 Gifhorn / DE | [1998/10] | Application number, filing date | 97114010.8 | 14.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | DE1996134260 | 24.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19634260 | [1998/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0826873 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0826873 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826873 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02M31/14, F02M69/46, F02F1/24 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
F02M53/00 (EP,US);
F02M55/025 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0606 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/10] | F02M31/14, F02M69/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1999/08] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Verteilung von Kraftstoff für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [1998/10] | English: | Device for distributing fuel for a combustion engine | [1998/10] | French: | Dispositif de distribution de carburant pour un moteur à combustion | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04183964 ; | [Y]US4955409 (TOKUDA TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 16 * * column 2, line 29 - line 39 * * column 2, line 55 - line 59 * * column 3, line 22 - line 26 * * column 3, line 35 - line 37 * * column 3, line 44 - line 54 * * column 4, line 3 - line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]US5311850 (MARTIN TIBY M [US]) [A] 2 * column 3, line 1 - line 18 * * column 3, line 25 - line 36 ** column 8, line 8 - line 41; figure 6A *; | [DA]EP0625637 (WEBER SRL [IT]) [DA] 1,5 * column 2, line 45 - line 46; figure 1 * * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921015), vol. 16, no. 498, Database accession no. (M - 1325), & JP04183964 A 19920630 (HINO MOTORS) [Y] 1 * abstract * |