EP0828029 - Calender roll having a cover of an elastic synthetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/05] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Voith Paper GmbH Birkschenweg 5 47803 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Finishing GmbH Birkschenweg 5 47803 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenzel, Reinhard Glindholzstrasse 19 47809 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Dornfeld, Peter Moerser Strasse 78 47803 Krefeld / DE | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing., et al Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1998/11] | Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Kühhornshofweg 10 60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114059.5 | 14.08.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | DE1996135845 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19635845 | [1998/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0828029 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0828029 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828029 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/00, D21G1/02 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
F16C13/00 (EP,US);
D21G1/0233 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/11] | D21G1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [1999/49] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kalanderwalze mit einem Bezug aus eleastischem Kunststoff | [1998/11] | English: | Calender roll having a cover of an elastic synthetic material | [1998/11] | French: | Cylindre de calandrage ayant une couverture d'une matière synthétique élastique | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.05.2002 | FR | 15.05.2002 | GB | 15.05.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/40] | FI | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | GB | 15.05.2002 | |
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 15.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3074695 (PETER HOLD, et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 11; figure - *; | [A]US3447600 (GREENE WILLIAM E) [A] 1 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 5; figure - * |